+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to TIA, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 36
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 513) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3070) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro.
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 10:35AM in conference room 211.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2520) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Fevella.
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-20 2:55PM in conference room 414.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to EET, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor