+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 10:40AM in conference room 423.
On March 13, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-17-20 10:40AM in House conference room 423.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 36
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 505) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2989) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro.
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-13-20 11:00AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2448) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, K. Kahele, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Fevella.
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-20 1:15PM in conference room 016.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced.