+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, HED, FIN, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 110) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 808) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Riviere.
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-15 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HEA/AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 265) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AGL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, Riviere, Chun Oakland, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, L. Thielen, Slom.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL deferred the measure until 02-17-15 2:45PM in conference room 414.
- The committee(s) on HEA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HEA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye, Kahele, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Wakai, Slom.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HEA/AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-15 1:30PM in conference room 224.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HEA/AGL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor