+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (49)
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Act 146, 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1249).
On June 26, 2014 in the House:
- Act 146, on 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1249).
On May 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751).
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720).
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Say voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Carroll, Choy, Fale, Hanohano, Har, Kawakami, McDermott, McKelvey, Oshiro, Thielen, Tokioka, Ward voting no (12) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14.
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 19-14) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 19-14).
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 2:20PM in conference room 224.
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Kahele, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Luke, Lowen, Nishimoto, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 10:00AM in conference room 224.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-21-14 10:00AM in conference room 224.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-16-14 1:35PM in conference room 224.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685).
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 676).
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Solomon Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Galuteria, Kahele, Slom Members.
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Evans, Luke Co-Chairs; Lowen, Nishimoto, Matsumoto Members.
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670).
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 659).
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Carroll, Choy, Fale, Hanohano, Har, Ito, Oshiro, Say, Tokioka, Ward voting no (10) and Representative(s) Belatti excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-08-14.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1602-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-31-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Awana, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Carroll, Choy, Fale, Hanohano, Kawakami, McDermott, McKelvey, Oshiro, Thielen, Ward voting no (10) and Representative(s) Takai, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1009-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, C. Lee, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; 4 Noes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Kawakami, Say, Fale; and Excused: none.
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-14-14 10:00AM in House conference room 325.
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 29
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 379) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2789) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-14 9:05AM in conference room 211.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-14 10:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2391) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Galuteria, Ihara, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ruderman, Slom.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-14 2:55PM in conference room 225.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor