+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 122) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 865) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 03-01-17 9:15AM in conference room 016.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
- Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 304) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Galuteria, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-17 3:05PM in conference room 224.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor