+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee on HWN deferred the measure.
- The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-05-14 2:00PM in conference room 225.
- The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 02-05-14 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-14 1:15PM in conference room 225.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL/HWN, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor