+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Thielen, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Evans, Har, McDermott voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, Souki excused (3).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1235-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane, McDermott.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-15-18 8:30AM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-18.
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-13-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 35
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 419) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye, Riviere, Wakai . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2705) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 11:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2391) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, K. Rhoads.
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, Espero, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Ihara.
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-18 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH/AEN, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor