+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
- Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2249) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, Galuteria, Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-18 3:15PM in conference room 224.
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to GVO, JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor