+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-30-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-30-16 2:00PM.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-28-16 2:20PM in House conference room 325.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1280-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Oshiro; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Tupola.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-18-16 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 26
- Pass First Reading
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 340) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2514) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Slom.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee on CPH will reconsider its previous decision made on 2/17/2016 and will hold a public decision making on 02-24-16 10:30AM in conference room 229.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Slom.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-16 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor