+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to TRN/WAL, EDB, FIN, referral sheet 26
- Pass First Reading
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 335) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Riviere, Ruderman). Transmitted to House.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16.
- Reported from TRE/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2760) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
- The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Kidani.
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-16 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to TRE/WAM.
- Reported from HOU/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2318) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to TRE/WAM.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Espero, Galuteria, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Slom, Baker, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman.
- The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Harimoto, Galuteria, Ihara, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Slom.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-16 2:55PM in conference room 225.
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to HOU/EET, TRE/WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor