+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 628).
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) Luke replaced Representative(s) Cullen as Co-Chairs.
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 657).
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Gabbard Co-Chair; Galuteria, K.Kahele, Slom.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Cullen Co-Chairs; Evans, Pouha.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649).
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 603).
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-16.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1698-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-07-16 2:01PM in House conference room 308.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1176-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Pouha excused (3).
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, Ing, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Pouha.
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-18-16 10:00AM in House conference room 325.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 14
- Pass First Reading
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 9) in amended form (SD 1).
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ruderman). Transmitted to House.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 02-09-16.
- 48 Hrs. Notice 02-08-16.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2037) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-16 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor