+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1203) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-25-15 2:40PM in conference room 325.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-25-15.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-23-15 2:45PM in House conference room 325.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Kawakami, LoPresti, Luke, Saiki excused (4).
- Reported from HLT/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 981) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro.
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro, Tupola.
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HUS on Wednesday, 03-18-15 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to HLT/HUS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 30
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 109) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 809) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-03-15 9:10AM in conference room 211.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 378) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Wakai, Baker, Riviere, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman.
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Kahele, Nishihara, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-15 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH/CPN, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.