+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-20-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 35
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 407) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2647) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Ihara, Ruderman.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-28-18 10:20AM in conference room 229.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-26-18 9:45AM in conference room 229.
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor