+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2207) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Slom.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL deferred the measure until 02-06-14 2:50PM in conference room 229.
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-14 2:55PM in conference room 229.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to AGL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor