+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, EEP, FIN, referral sheet 29
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 357) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-04-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2761) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi.
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-27-14 9:10AM in conference room 211.
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-14 10:35AM in conference room 211.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HTH/ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2429) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Chun Oakland, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom.
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ENE deferred the measure until 02-13-14 2:45PM in conference room 225.
- The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-12-14 1:00PM in conference room 229.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-14 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH/ENE, WAM.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor