+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
- The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
On February 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 1:00PM in conference room 016.
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/PSM, WAM.
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.