+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TEC/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2518) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, English, Moriwaki, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TEC/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-20 3:45PM in conference room 225.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to TEC/GVO, WAM.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor