+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1079-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-16-16 9:30AM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-16-16 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Monday, 03-14-16 2:15PM in House conference room 329.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, HED, FIN, referral sheet 26
- Pass First Reading
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 326) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2782) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Chun Oakland, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-16 9:35AM in conference room 211.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HEA/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2375) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman.
- The committee(s) on HEA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HEA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Gabbard, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HEA/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-16 1:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to HEA/CPH, WAM.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor