+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1132-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Fale voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3).
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Carroll, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan.
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-19-14 10:30AM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-19-14 at 10:30am.
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-14-14 9:00AM in House conference room 329.
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 28
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 347) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from HMS/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2601) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Taniguchi.
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/JDL deferred the measure until 02-18-14 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-14 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/JDL.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor