+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (48)
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1382).
On July 9, 2019 in the House:
- Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1382).
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-19 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202)
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1202)
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Hashem, Kong, Okimoto, Say, Tokioka voting no (7) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Takumi, Kitagawa, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 134).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 134) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 10:00AM in conference room 309.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 1:00PM in conference room 309.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 951).
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; Fevella.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Takumi, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 650).
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Kong, Okimoto, Say voting no (5) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2121), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-29-19 3:30PM in House conference room 308.
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kong, Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1597), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Kong; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1357) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 03-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 9) in amended form (SD 1).
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 02-28-19.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 669) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor