+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM.
- Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2274) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/WAM.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Ruderman, L. Thielen.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-11-16 1:15PM in conference room 016.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HMS, CPH/WAM.
- The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-16 1:45PM in conference room 016.
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS, CPH.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.