+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Act 063, 4/30/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1163).
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Act 063, on 4/30/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1163).
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699).
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Rhoads Chair; C. Lee, Thielen.
- Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 691).
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading. 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Wakai.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-13 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
- Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-15-13.
- One Day Notice 04-15-13.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 608).
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-11-13.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-09-13.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-05-13.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-04-13.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-03-13.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 395).
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, C. Lee, Tokioka excused (3).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1232) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Har, Brower, Carroll, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Wooley.
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-12-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 30
- Pass First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 55) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 606) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 182) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-13 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor