+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (51)
On July 6, 2018 in the House:
- Act 109, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1210).
On July 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Act 109, 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1210).
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705).
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849).
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Say, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Luke; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 10:30AM in Conference Room 329.
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Keith-Agaran, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 145-18).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18.
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 145-18) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18.
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 329.
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 9:30AM in conference room 329.
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 9:30AM in conference room 329.
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-24-18 10:00AM in conference room 329.
On April 20, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-23-18 9:30AM in conference room 329.
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 794).
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Keith-Agaran, English Co-Chairs.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Luke Co-Chairs; Tupola.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784).
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 605).
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Har, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-18.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1988-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Kobayashi, Ward; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Tupola.
On March 24, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 4:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) DeCoite, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1503-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Bill re-scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-20-18 10:00AM in conference room 309.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-20-18 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 36
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 382) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Taniguchi). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2913) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 10:45AM in conference room 211.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2509) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, S. Chang, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Taniguchi.
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-18 3:30PM in conference room 229.
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to LBR, WAM.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor