+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1291) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Holt, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 03-22-17 11:00AM in House conference room 309.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4).
- Reported from EDN/HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1126) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDB.
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Har, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing.
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Har, Creagan, Hashem, McKelvey, Ohno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ing.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN/HED on Wednesday, 03-15-17 2:01PM in House conference room 309.
- Re-referred to EDN/HED, EDB, FIN, referral sheet 29
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EDN/HED, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 117) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 899) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 279) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Keith-Agaran.
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Dela Cruz; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Riviere.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-17 3:15PM in conference room 229.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU/HRE, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor