+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 28
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 341) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-04-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2633) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-14 9:25AM in conference room 211.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from AGL/ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2317) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Slom.
- The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Slom.
On January 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on AGL/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-14 3:30PM in conference room 225.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to AGL/ENE, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor