+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HWN/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2349) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, S. Chang.
- The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, English, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green.
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HWN/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-18 2:18PM in conference room 016.
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to HWN/HRE, WAM.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.