+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-17 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.