+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, Quinlan, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (5) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
- Reported from WAL/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1353-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McDermott; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Cullen, Kong, Lowen, McKelvey; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee.
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/HSG on Tuesday, 03-20-18 11:20AM in House conference room 423.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to WAL/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 36
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 376) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2748) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Inouye, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, L. Thielen.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-28-18 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WTL.
- Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2190) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WTL.
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-18 2:55PM in conference room 225.
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to HOU, WTL.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.