+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 36
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 375) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2564) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Shimabukuro.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-08-18 11:15AM in conference room 211.
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-18 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.