+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1303-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Oshiro.
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-23-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-23-16 at 2:00 PM.
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-21-16 3:00PM in House conference room 325.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1105-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-15-16 10:30AM in House conference room 309.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 26
- Pass First Reading
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 316) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Riviere, Ruderman). Transmitted to House.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2759) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Taniguchi.
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, K.Kahele, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL/WAM deferred the measure until 03-01-16 10:30AM in conference room 211.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-16 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
- Reported from HMS/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2409) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere, Harimoto, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Ruderman, Slom.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Nishihara, Ruderman.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-09-16 1:15PM in conference room 016.
- The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-05-16 10:30AM in conference room 229.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-16 1:15PM in conference room 016.
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/CPH, JDL/WAM.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.