+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 29, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-29-16 at 4:20PM in Conference Room 423.
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-29-16 2:15PM in conference room 423.
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-16 2:10PM in conference room 423.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-26-16 2:00PM in conference room 423.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620).
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) Ward replaced Representative(s) Matsumoto as conferee(s).
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613).
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Wakai Co-Chair; Kidani.
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Kawakami, Jordan Co-Chairs; Brower, Matsumoto.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 653).
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649).
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-14-16.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 499).
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Kobayashi, McKelvey, Ohno, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Ing, Kong, Oshiro, Thielen excused (6). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1596-16), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-16 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1175-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Pouha excused (3).
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ohno, Matsumoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-17-16 10:01AM in conference room 312.
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-17-16.
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 03-15-16 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 26
- Pass First Reading
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 306) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2592) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Galuteria.
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-16 1:00PM in conference room 211.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2107) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-16 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor