+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Act 035, 04/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1135).
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Act 035, on 04/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1135).
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Takayama, Rhoads, Yamashita Co-Chairs; San Buenaventura, Ward.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 650).
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading. 20 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Keith-Agaran, Slom, L. Thielen.
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 591).
- Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-15-16.
- One Day Notice 04-15-16.
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1674-16), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On April 2, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:31PM in House conference room 308.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
- Reported from PBS/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1220-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Yamashita, Aquino, Ichiyama, Johanson, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Keohokalole, Tupola.
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Brower, Kawakami, McDermott.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS/JUD on Thursday, 03-17-16 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to PBS/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26
- Pass First Reading
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 300) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16.
- Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2604) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, K.Kahele, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-16 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL/WAM.
- Reported from PSM/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2307) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL/WAM.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman.
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-16 8:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/CPH, JDL/WAM.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor