+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-27-18 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 225.
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 2:00PM in conference room 225.
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 225.
On April 20, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 812).
On April 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; Baker, Wakai Co-Chairs.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Takumi, Lowen Co-Chairs; Ward.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784).
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 602).
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1964-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Todd, Tupola.
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-04-18 2:30PM in House conference room 308.
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1336-18), recommending referral to FIN.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Say; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, LoPresti, Mizuno.
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-21-18 2:15PM in House conference room 329.
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1191-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Kong, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane, McDermott.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-15-18 8:30AM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-18.
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-13-18 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 358) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2843) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Shimabukuro.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TRE/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2383) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Nishihara.
- The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-18 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to TRE/CPH, WAM.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRE/ETT/CPH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor