+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Act 037, 04/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1137).
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Act 037, on 04/29/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1137).
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620).
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) Tupola replaced Representative(s) Pouha as conferee(s).
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Lowen Co-Chairs; Evans, Pouha.
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On April 15, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 650).
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading. 20 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Keith-Agaran, Slom, L. Thielen.
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-15-16.
- Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-15-16.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 04-14-16.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 496).
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Hashem, Ing, Kong, Oshiro, Thielen excused (6). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1609-16), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On April 2, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:30PM in conference room 308.
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 04-05-16 at 2:30PM.
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-16 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1244-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Rhoads, Kawakami, C. Lee.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-22-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1089-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Nishimoto, Yamane, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Say, Thielen.
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-15-16 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 26
- Pass First Reading
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 297).
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House.
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-08-16.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2778) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi.
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-16 1:30PM in conference room 211.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WLA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2167) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLA were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Dela Cruz, Riviere, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-16 10:00AM in conference room 224.
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to WLA, WAM.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor