+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1444-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Keohokalole, Holt, Ichiyama, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson.
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 03-21-18 10:50AM in House conference room 309.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 36
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 354) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2866) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 11:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2311) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria.
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-18 1:15PM in conference room 414.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to ETT, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor