+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 236) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, Harimoto, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-17 1:15PM in conference room 225.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRE, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor