+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (50)
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-16 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-16 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On April 26, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-27-16 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-16 3:15pm in conference room 016.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-16 10:00AM in conference room 016.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-16 10:30AM in conference room 016.
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 657).
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Chun Oakland, Keith-Agaran, Tokuda Co-Chairs; Kidani.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Nakashima, McKelvey, Luke Co-Chairs; Fukumoto Chang.
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 588).
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649).
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Tupola, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ing, Thielen excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-16.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1643-16) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-30-16 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Oshiro, Tokioka, Tupola, Woodson excused (6).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1267-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Oshiro.
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-23-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-23-16 at 2:00 PM.
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from HLT/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1077-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Tokioka excused (4).
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-21-16 3:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Ichiyama, San Buenaventura, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har, Johanson, LoPresti.
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/LAB on Wednesday, 03-16-16 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to HLT/LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 26
- Pass First Reading
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 292) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16.
- Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2601) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, K.Kahele, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-16 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Governor re: Designating the Hawaii Department of Labor and Industrial Relations as the State's Health Insurance Exchange (Gov. Msg. No. 9).
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
- Reported from CPH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2145) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM.
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere, Harimoto, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Ruderman, Slom.
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Nishihara, Ruderman.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 02-09-16 1:15PM in conference room 016.
- The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-05-16 10:30AM in conference room 229.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-16 1:15PM in conference room 016.
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH/HMS, JDL/WAM.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor