+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- The conference committee deferred the measure.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-18 3:15PM in conference room 329.
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 794).
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Baker, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Cullen, McDermott.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784).
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 600).
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, DeCoite, Har, Ito, Kong, Matsumoto, Ohno, Say, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting no (11) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tupola, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt excused (2).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1945-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tupola; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto.
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:30AM in House conference room 308.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 36
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 347) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2875) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Riviere, Shimabukuro.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-01-18 10:45AM in conference room 211.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 11:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDC/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2153) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen.
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Ihara, Ruderman.
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-18 8:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC/CPH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.