+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2450) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-16 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor