+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 703).
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
- Passed Final Reading. 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-21-14.
- Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-21-14.
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-10-14 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 685).
On April 14, 2014 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Evans, Rhoads, Lowen Co-Chairs; Hanohano, Fale Members.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 624).
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670).
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1598-14), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem.
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-31-14 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 21, 2014 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1210-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Ito, Kawakami, C. Lee, Tsuji, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Nakashima, Wooley.
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-20-14 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 934-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Say excused (1).
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Hanohano, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Say, Thielen.
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-10-14 8:45AM in House conference room 325.
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3 (Sen. Com. No. 1).
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 28
- Pass First Reading
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 317) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Hee, Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-04-14.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2739) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kouchi.
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-14 9:10AM in conference room 211.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2291) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Ihara, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Dela Cruz, Taniguchi.
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Galuteria.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL/JDL added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-07-14 1:45PM in conference room 225.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL/JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor