+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2568) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-20 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, JDC.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor