+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784).
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 554).
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-18.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1981-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Holt, Todd.
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-04-18 1:30PM in House conference room 308. Copy of proposed draft available at www.capitol.hawaii.gov.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1346) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Takayama, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Fukumoto.
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-23-17 2:05PM in House conference room 329.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Morikawa, Nakamura, Tokioka excused (5).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1100), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Todd, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro.
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-14-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
- Pass First Reading
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 114) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 713) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ruderman.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-27-17 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.