+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 15, 2020 in the House:
- Act 062, on 09/15/2020 (Gov. Msg. No. 1167).
On September 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Act 062, 09/15/2020 (Gov. Msg. No. 1167).
On July 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled to Governor.
On July 10, 2020 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 632).
On July 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On July 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 07-10-20.
- Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 07-10-20.
On July 6, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On July 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 407).
On July 2, 2020 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 07-06-20.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1271-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On June 29, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi.
On June 26, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 06-29-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Matayoshi excused (2).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1200-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On June 19, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Monday, 06-22-20 10:00AM in House conference room 329.
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 9:10AM in conference room 309.
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-17-20 9:10AM in House conference room 309.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 36
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 406) in amended form (SD 2).
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3193) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele.
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 10:35AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2875) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-20 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to LCA, WAM.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor