+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HTH/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2379) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-12-14 1:30PM in conference room 229.
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Gabbard, Galuteria, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Solomon.
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HTH/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-14 1:45PM in conference room 229.
On January 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to HTH/JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor