+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 16, 2020 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 9:00AM in conference room 309.
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-17-20 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 36
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 398) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-03-20.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3321) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele.
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-20 10:35AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from LCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2814) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Ihara, S. Chang, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on LCA has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-20 2:45PM in conference room 224.
- Referred to LCA, WAM.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor