+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2737) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella.
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 1:35PM in conference room 229.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDC.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor