+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1195) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Lowen.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-17-17 10:30AM in House conference room 325.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 24
- Pass First Reading
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Tokuda). Transmitted to House.
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 14) in amended form (SD 1).
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 02-21-17.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 534) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Harimoto, Taniguchi, Wakai.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 9:30AM in conference room 211.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced.