+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788).
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; Keith-Agaran, Kim Co-Chairs.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Cullen Co-Chairs; Yamashita, Matsumoto.
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 574).
On April 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 468).
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt, C. Lee, LoPresti, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (6). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1857-18), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
On March 24, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
- Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1439-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Kong, Learmont, Ohno, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Onishi, Quinlan.
On March 16, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-20-18 2:00PM in conference room 309.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-18 at 2:00 PM.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-15-18 2:10PM in conference room 309.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-18.
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-13-18 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 36
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 330) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-06-18.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2930) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-18 11:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 11:00AM in conference room 211.
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2012) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim, S. Chang, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani.
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-18 1:15PM in conference room 224.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to HRE, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor