+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On March 29, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-03-18 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, C. Lee, McKelvey, Souki, Todd, Ward excused (6).
- Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1259-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Creagan, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-15-18 10:30AM in House conference room 312.
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 36
- Pass First Reading
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 323) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2842) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Shimabukuro.
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-18 10:00AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
- Reported from PSM/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2404) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
- The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 2:00PM in conference room 229.
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM/HMS, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor