+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommitted to JDL.
On April 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Deferred until 05-03-16.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-29-16.
- Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-29-16.
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-16 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 620).
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) Pouha replaced Representative(s) McDermott as conferee(s).
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 613).
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Kawakami, McDermott.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 649).
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate disagrees with House amendments.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 573).
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Jordan, McKelvey, Pouha, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Ing, Keohokalole, Lowen, Matsumoto, San Buenaventura, Tupola voting no (7) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On April 8, 2016 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-16.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1710-16) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Brower, Hashem, C. Lee, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kawakami, Morikawa; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Creagan; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Rhoads, Belatti, Nakashima, Thielen.
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Pouha excused (3).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1179-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, Nishimoto, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Pouha.
On March 18, 2016 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 03-21-16 10:00AM in House conference room 325.
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 26
- Pass First Reading
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 264) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-16.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2576) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, K.Kahele, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 02-29-16 9:35AM in conference room 016.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-25-16 9:00AM in conference room CR016.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Introduced.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor